U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Staat v. Walmart Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Remark]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • September 28, 2022: [Remand]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • May 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 22, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.