U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report (Addenda) - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 20, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.