U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bargar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 27, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.