U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loves Him
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 12, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.