U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goudiaby et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 11, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 14, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Vacate]
  • April 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.