U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 10, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.