U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Montana Environmental Information Center et al v. Office of the Secretary of the Interior et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 18, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 18, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.