U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • June 16, 2022: [Appear]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • June 10, 2022: [Appear]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.