U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fairburn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 02, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.