U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lind
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.