U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Palmer et al v. City of Billings et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 05, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 18, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 18, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.