U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:12-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • April 04, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss ]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Text Notice Unsealing Pursuant to Standing Order BMM-17]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.