U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-mj-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SiJohn
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Transfer Letter - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • March 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5 - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Other District Deft - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.