U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Lowder v. Safeway
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 14, 2022: [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Remark]
  • April 25, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.