U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Upper Missouri Waterkeeper v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 24, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.