U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Kanvick v. Billings Public Schools, District #2 All past and future Trustees et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 30, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 31, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.