U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Lauf v. NewRez LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 06, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.