U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:10-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clements
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 19, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 28, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.