U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Wells v. Salmonsen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • August 22, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Expedite]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 29, 2022: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.