U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00007-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Murphy et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.