U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.