U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nightshoot
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 11, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.