U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:94-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaFromboise
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.