U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Cavanaugh v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Administrative Record]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.