U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Mosby v. Unknown Law Enforcement Officer, Prosecutor, or Judge
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 31, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.