U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wadda et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 16, 2022: [Dismiss ]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.