U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hagberg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 23, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.