U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Moe v. BNSF Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 19, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • July 07, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 01, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 01, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.