U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Ariegwe v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 07, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.