U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Miller v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Extending Scheduling Order Deadlines - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Remark]
  • April 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.