U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Lozier v. Attorney General of the State of Montana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 03, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 03, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 04, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.