U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Estate of Daniel Keith Ross v. Gallatin County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Strike - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 04, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.