U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Lowry v. Capt. Bragg et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • July 25, 2022: [Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 20, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order of Entry]
  • July 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 18, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.