U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Zhu v. High Altitude, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Default Judgment - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 06, 2022: [Entry of Default]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Dismissing Parties - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Remark]
  • April 27, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Lis Pendens]
  • April 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 04, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.