U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Thielen v. Horizon Credit Union et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 08, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Remark]
  • April 05, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 05, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.