U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 05, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.