U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Mid-Continent Casualty Company et al v. Reflections at Copper Ridge, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Status Report Order]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 05, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 05, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.