U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Moody v. Adamson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Lift Stay - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 14, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 24, 2022: [Stay]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 13, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.