U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Vondra et al v. City of Billings et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stay]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • July 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • July 21, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 21, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • May 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 06, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 06, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.