U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Rusk v. McGrath et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Pro Se Response to Order - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Pro Se Response to Order - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • July 03, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • July 02, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 07, 2022: [Pro Se Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Joinder - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Errata - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 27, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Exparte Motion - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • April 10, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 07, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.