U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Laroque
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.