U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Filing 2255 - MT]
  • May 08, 2025: [2255 (Motion to Vacate) - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Strike ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Suppress ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.