U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garces
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Waiver of Interstate Agreement on Detainers]
  • July 11, 2022: [Quash ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.