U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dailey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2023: [Amended Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • December 14, 2022: [Revoke]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Revocation of Pretrial Release Hearing]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Revoke]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 11, 2022: [Revoke]
  • August 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.