U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Azure
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.