U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Springer v. Northern Engineering & Consulting
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • April 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2022: [Remark]
  • April 08, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.