U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chabot
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report (Addendum) - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Add Counts]
  • April 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.