U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • July 01, 2022: [Summons]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.