U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Keefe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Letter - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 15, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.