U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Menth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.